Ana Komparić Devčić (NZ)
Born on 18 April 1976 in Rijeka. Graduated from Rijeka School of Medicine. Doctor of Medicine.
Begin of parliamentary mandate:
End of parliamentary mandate:
Changes during parliamentary mandate:
on 14 December 2018 the MP ceased to be the member of Social Democratic Party of Croatia and commenced performing MP duties as Independent Member of the Parliament
Party affiliation:
Independent
Previous parliamentary functions:
- Deputy Chairperson Committee on Human and National Minority Rights (from 28 October 2016 to 18 October 2019)
- Member Defence Committee (from 28 October 2016 to 13 December 2019)
- Member Health and Social Policy Committee (from 28 October 2016 to 20 April 2018)
- Member Committee on the Family, Youth and Sports (from 28 October 2016 to 13 December 2019)
- Member Elections, Appointments and Administration Committee (from 14 October 2016 to 28 October 2016)
- Member Committee of Inquiry into the responsibility for the results of the management and disposal of financial and other resources of the Imunology Institute (from 17 March 2017 to 19 September 2017)
Parliamentary Friendship Groups membership:
Elected from the list of the:
- Social Democratic Party of Croatia, Croatian People's Party – Liberal Democrats, Croatian Peasant Party and Croatian Party of Pensioners